Morris v. Saint Louis University et al
Plaintiff: Morris and Dianne Morris
Defendant: Saint Louis University, Sandra Johnson and Denise Woods
Case Number: 4:2016cv01752
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Dismissing Count III of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 13], is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, [Doc. No. 14], is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event Plaintiff re-files her FMLA claim, Plaintiff shall reimburse Defendants their attorneys fees and costs associated with the removal and subsequent remand of this matter.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. #13 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/21/17. cc St. Louis County(CLA)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation filed by Dianne Morris; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (Mediation will be extended until after the Court rules on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/1/17. (KJS)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Dianne Morris. (Banks, Vincent)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Vincent Anthony Banks III ADR Completion Deadline due by 3/13/2017. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 3/24/2017. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 2/3/2017. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/28/16. (KJS)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2-Standard Motion to Join Parties due by 1/6/2017. Discovery Completion due by 7/7/2017. ADR Future Reference 1/13/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2017. Jury Trial set for 1/8/2018 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/28/16. (KJS)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for December 1, 2016, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/28/16. (KJS)
November 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods. (Mullen, Sarah)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods. . (Mullen, Sarah)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE Attendance of Case Management Conference: by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods (Mullen, Sarah)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Plaintiff Dianne Morris. (Banks, Vincent)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Dianne Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Banks, Vincent)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/23/2016. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/1/2016 11:45 AM in Telephone before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/14/16. (CLA)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Statement of Affirmative and Additional Defenses by Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods.(Perryman, Neal)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis City Circuit Court, filed by Dianne Morris.(JWD)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Denise Woods, Saint Louis University, Sandra Johnson. (JWD) Modified on 11/10/2016 to correct filer (JWD).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis City Circuit Court, filed by Dianne Morris.(JWD)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Mullen, Sarah)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit COnfirmation of State Court Filing)(Mullen, Sarah) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JWD).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsel of Removal: by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Removal)(Mullen, Sarah)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods. (Mullen, Sarah)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah E. Mullen for Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods. (Mullen, Sarah)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saint Louis City Circuit COurt, case number 1222-CC-09388, with receipt number 0865-5671555, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Denise Woods, Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Petition, #2 Supplement State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Mullen, Sarah)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ENTRY of Appearance by Neal F. Perryman for Defendants Sandra Johnson, Saint Louis University, Denise Woods. (Perryman, Neal)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Saint Louis University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Morris
Represented By: Vincent Anthony Banks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Louis University
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: Sarah E. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Johnson
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: Sarah E. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Woods
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: Sarah E. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?