O'Rourke v. King et al
Plaintiff: Scott O'Rourke
Defendant: David King, Steven Burle, Ari B Zelmanow, Daniel Isom, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Bettye Battle-Turner, Francis G Slay and DOES 1-3
Case Number: 4:2016cv01795
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part, to the extent that the Court's prior award of $500 in attorneys' fees (ECF No. 55 ) is VACATED. ECF No. 56. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 12, 2018. (BRP)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs renewed motion to compel and forsanctions is GRANTED in part, as follows. ECF No. 49 . (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/23/18. (JAB)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth above. No later than January 5, 2018, Defendants shall either produce any outstanding documents in their possession, cus tody, or control responsive to the discovery requests at issue in Plaintiffs motion, or if all such documents have been produced, produce a letter to Plaintiff certifying that fact.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/22/2017. (KCB)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to quash and for a protective order is DENIED in part, with respect to the notice of deposition of Lieutenant Timothy Sachs, and is otherwise GRANTED. ECF No. 37 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer in good faith to find a mutually agreeable date for the deposition within the next 30 days. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/8/2017. (CLO)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Release Trial Transcript is DENIED. ECF No. 32 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/27/2017. (KCB)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint is DENIED. ECF No. 7 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis shall be dismissed to the extent it is named as a separate defendant. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 28, 2017. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Rourke v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott O'Rourke
Represented By: Nathaniel Richard Carroll
Represented By: Edward James Hall
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Blake Alexander Strode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David King
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Burle
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari B Zelmanow
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Isom
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gray
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Irwin
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erwin O. Switzer
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Battle-Turner
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis G Slay
Represented By: Henry F. Luepke, III(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?