Reuter v. Borbonus et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Reuter
Defendant: John N. Borbonus, St. Louis County Missouri and State of Missouri
Case Number: 4:2016cv02126
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend judgment which denied plaintiff's amended complaint (#24) and plaintiff's motion to amend judgment which granted defendants' motions to dismiss (#26) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/11/2017. (JMC)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint (#22) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/9/2017. (JMC)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions to dismiss (#13, #15, #18) are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/2017. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reuter v. Borbonus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Borbonus
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Spahr(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Missouri
Represented By: Michael E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?