Mills v. St. Louis County Government et al
Plaintiff: Theoda Mills
Defendant: St. Louis County Government, Steven Stenger, Sharon Gardner, Donald Edwards and Joyce Theard
Case Number: 4:2017cv00257
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Patricia L. Cohen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that St. Louis County's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 49 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 6/29/2018. (CBL)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the petition (ECF No. 45 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 5/8/18. (EAB)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the remaining Defendants' unopposed second motion to dismiss [ECF No. 33] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs ADA claim against Defendant Steve Stenger is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for an award of punitive damages from Defendant St. Louis County Government under the ADA is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on October 23, 2017. (MCB)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Gardner's and Theard's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 19 ) is GRANTED and the County Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 7 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions are granted with respect to Plaintiff's claims for discrimination based on age and disability under the MHRA (Counts I and II) and those claims are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERE D that the motion is granted with respect to Plaintiff's claim for disability discrimination under the ADA (Count III) against Defendants Theard and Gardner, and the ADA claim is dismissed with prejudice against Defendants Theard and Gardner. The case will proceed on Plaintiffs Count III against the County Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/24/2017. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. St. Louis County Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theoda Mills
Represented By: Celestine Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Government
Represented By: Priscilla Frances Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Stenger
Represented By: Priscilla Frances Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Theard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?