Place v. Russell Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Place
Defendant: Russell Technologies, Inc., Seth Russell and Nicole Russell
Case Number: 4:2017cv00399
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion for order conditionally certifying action 30 is granted, and the Court conditionally certifies a class of all current and former computer employees employed by defendants within th e last three years from the date of this Order whose primary duty was to perform external "help desk" functions for defendant's clients. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall provide plaintiff's counsel with a computer-rea der data file (in Excel format) containing the names, and last known contact information, to include physical address(es), mailing address(es), e-mail address(es), and telephone number(s), to the extent such information is available, of all potent ial class members within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff may send out a notice consistent with Exhibit 1 to the joint motion on an expedited schedule via U.S. mail and e-mail to all potential cla ss members, using a 40-day opt-in period, running from the date that the class notice is first disseminated by plaintiff's counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add all opt-in plaintiffs who file consents to join as plaintiffs on the caption of the docket sheet. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/25/17. (KXS)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file an amended joint proposed scheduling plan as set out above by no later than Wednesday, May 24, 2017.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/22/17. (LGK)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss 23 is denied. This case will be set for a Rule 16 conference by separate Order.Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/13/17. (ARL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Place v. Russell Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Place
Represented By: Samuel W. Moore
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Henry P. Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Russell
Represented By: Henry P. Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Russell
Represented By: Henry P. Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?