Masek v. Chastiain et al
Plaintiff: Michael D. Masek
Defendant: Antonina Chastiain
Case Number: 4:2017cv00660
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Antonina Chastain's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 26 ]. An appropriate judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/30/18. (JWD) (Main Document 37 replaced on 8/30/2018 to correct PDF error. NEF regenerated to parties) (JWD).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint on a Court form in accordance with the specific instructions set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that the Clerk of Court shall forward to plaintiff a Court form for a Civil Rights Complaint Under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on a Court form within thirty day s in accordance with the Court's instructions, the case will proceed only on the original complaint against defendant Antonia Chastain for denial of telephone calls and of religious materials under the First and Fourteenth Amendments. Response to Court due by 5/13/2017.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/13/2017. (MRC)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve defendant Antonia Chastain with process, in accordance with the Courts agreement with the Missouri Department of Mental Health. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend [ECF No. 6 ] is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect that Blake Snyder is actually Blake Schneider. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Blake Schneider, Lisa Ellis, Felix Vincenz, and Praveen Nimmagadda are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/7/2017. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masek v. Chastiain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Masek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonina Chastiain
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?