Richter v. St. Louis City Jail et al
Plaintiff: Richter and Jason Christopher Richter
Defendant: St. Louis City Jail, MSI Workhouse, Dale Glass, Leonard Edwards, Tonya Harry, Gerome Fields, Scott Weber and Alexis Lee Silshe
Case Number: 4:2017cv00825
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (MCB)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered herewith, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith.Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 20, 2017. (MCB)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED than an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 20, 2017. (MCB)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8, 9, 10. sent to non-electronic party this date Wed Sep 20 14:36:55 CDT 2017 (Berg, Melanie)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit a second amended complaint on a court-provided form no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/3/2017. (Order and form sent to plaintiff this date.)(CBL)
June 12, 2017 Filing 6 AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT re #1 DCM Complaint by Plaintiff Jason Christopher Richter. (EAB)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.08 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint on a court-provided form no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Memorandum and Order may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/12/17. (EAB) (Copy of Order and form sent to plaintiff on 5/12/17) (EAB).
March 27, 2017 Filing 4 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Jason Christopher Richter. (CBL)
March 27, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Jason Christopher Richter. (CBL)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400.00 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without prejudice. Response to Court due by 4/8/2017. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on March 9, 2017. (Order sent to plaintiff along with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis this date.)(MCB)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. sent to non-electronic party this date Thu Mar 9 16:24:27 CST 2017 (Berg, Melanie)
March 3, 2017 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
March 3, 2017 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (DJO)
March 3, 2017 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Mar 3 14:00:59 CST 2017 (admin,)
March 2, 2017 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant MSI Workhouse, St. Louis City Jail, filed by Jason Christopher Richter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Judge Assignment Label, #3 Envelope)(DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richter v. St. Louis City Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis City Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSI Workhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerome Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Lee Silshe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Christopher Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?