Morrison v. Hale et al
Plaintiff: Herbert W. Morrison, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew Hale, Timothy Sweeso, Shawn Reiland, Timothy Green, John Doe 1-2, City of Florissant, Ashley Bailey-Smith, Steven Grim, Tina M. Broadway, Robyn Ambs and Kathleen M. Pickett
Case Number: 4:2017cv00875
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Nannette A. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Copy of Sealed Document (Doc. 111 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/8/19. (KJS)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shallpay an initial partial filing fee of $37.52. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable toClerk, United States District Court, a nd to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prisonidentification number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for theappeal of the instant action. Response to Court due by 5/29/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 4/29/19. (CLA)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 63) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply (Doc. 52) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plain tiffs Motion to Compel (Doc. 55) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Secondary Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery (Doc. 59) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Revised Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery (Doc. 60) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 66) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Amended Secondary Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery (Doc. 67) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Stay (Doc. 71) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion t o Strike Plaintiffs Exhibits 8 and 12 (Doc. 78) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Exhibit 9 (Doc. 79) is DENIED.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Redact Exhibits (Doc. 89) is DENIED as moot. An appropriate judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. 59 67 78 77 71 60 52 55 79 77 63 89 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/19/19. (CLA)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery, (Doc. No. 46 ) is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Compelling Supplemented Answers to Interrogatories (D oc. No. 48 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. Defendant is ordered to provide the names and employers of each person who escorted Morrison to the Florissant holding facility on November 11, 2013, within fourteen days after the date this order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 4/16/18. (KJS)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff two blank subpoena forms, which Plaintiff may fill out as required by this Memorandum and Order and return to the Court with a Memorandum for Clerk request ing that the subpoena be served by the U.S. Marshal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff requests additional blank subpoena forms in the future, each such request must be accompanied by a Memorandum for Clerk that includes the following informa tion for each requested subpoena: (1) the name of the person or entity Plaintiff seeks to serve; (2) the specific documents Plaintiff seeks; (3) how the specified documents are relevant to Plaintiffs case; (4) why Plaintiff believes the person or entity to be subpoenaed has possession of the documents; and (5) how Plaintiff will provide the necessary costs related to document productions. (Mailed Plaintiff two blank subpoena forms attached to this order herein.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/20/17. (KJS)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINON MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs official capacity claims against defendantAndrew Hale are DISMISSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or causeprocess to issue upon the amended complaint as to defendant Andrew Hale in his individual capacity.IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/17/17. (CLA)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $35.83 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of thi s Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint in accordance with the instructions set forth herein within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Cle rk of Court shall mail to plaintiff two blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint forms. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed. If plaintiff fails to timely comply with this Memorandum and Order, the Court may dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. 2 ( Response to Court due by 6/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/17/17. cc: 2 copies mailed to pltff.(CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Hale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert W. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sweeso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Reiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Florissant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Bailey-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Grim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina M. Broadway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Ambs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?