Watkins v. Presson et al
Plaintiff: Chauncey Leon Watkins
Defendant: Unknown Presson, Unknown Carmen and Unknown Sullivan
Case Number: 4:2017cv01243
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 09/11/2017. (KCB)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 7 and # 10 ] are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no filing fee will be assessed at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motions to supplement his complaint [Doc. # 5 and # 6 ] are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must f ile an amended complaint on the Court's form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for non- compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/25/2017. (Copy of Order and Complaint Form Mailed)(CLO)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis form for prisoners. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or subm it a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also file a certified copy of his prison account statement f or the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for noncompliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/11/17. (EAB) (Copy of Order and Motion sent to Plaintiff on 4/11/17).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Presson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chauncey Leon Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Presson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Carmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?