Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. JohnEd, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 58, Gregg Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, David Doerr, Rich Lucks, Joseph F. Mueller, Carl Farrell, Donald Thomas, Daniel Wienstroer, Michael Smith, Walter Bazan, Jr., Steve Phillipp, Jr., Mark Borgmann, Dane McGraw, Joseph Keipp, Tim Weis and Fred Phillipp, Jr.
Defendant: JohnEd, Inc. and Edward Benson
Case Number: 4:2017cv01271
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Edward Benson's Renewed Objection to Deposition Notice and Motion to Quash (ECF No. 54 ) is GRANTED without prejudice. The notice of taking deposition of Benson on February 11, 2021, is quashed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 2/9/2021. (NEP)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Stipulation and Order (ECF No. 49 ) is APPROVED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Garnishee Jefferson Bank and Trust Company shall release $1,850.00 to Edward Benson, in cash, upon presen tation of identification and execution of an agreed upon Receipt in the form of Exhibit A (ECF No.49 at 4). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Garnishee Jefferson Bank and Trust Company shall tender the remaining balance to Plaintiffs/Judgment Creditors as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Pay-In Order (ECF No. 48 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/20/2019. (NEP)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (ECF No. 25 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are awarded default judgment against Defendants, jointly and severally, for a total of $45,687.43,2 upon which Plaintiffs may immediately execute. Plaintiffs are required to serve a copy of this Default Order upon Defendants and to file an affidavit demonstrating compliance with this Default Order. The Court reserves jurisdiction to make such further orders and grant such additional relief, including but not limited to the entry of partial and final judgments, as it deems appropriate. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/7/19. (KJS)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than September 17, 2018, Plaintiffs shall refile, if necessary, their motion and exhibits for the time period of January 1, 2015, to August 18, 2017, as ordered by the Court, making any necessary adjustments to their requested recovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/24/18. (ARL)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Order and to Compel an Accounting (ECF No. 11 ) is GRANTED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/18/17. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. JohnEd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 58
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Smith
Represented By: James P. Faul
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Pension Trust
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Doerr
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Lucks
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Mueller
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Farrell
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wienstroer
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Bazan, Jr.
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Phillipp, Jr.
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Borgmann
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane McGraw
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Keipp
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Weis
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Phillipp, Jr.
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JohnEd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?