Williams v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Jared Martel Williams
Defendant: Shawn Robinson, Sonya White, Unknown Miller, Unknown Love, Unknown Sturdivant, Unknown House, Unknown Gayden, Toriano Tate, Tiffany Smith, Unknown Shields and Unknown Goodwin
Case Number: 4:2017cv01282
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 126 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/13/2020. (KEK)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Counts Three and Four of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 116 ) is GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/3/20. (KJS)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueupon the complaint as to defendant Brandon House in his individual capacity. Service shall be effectuated at the address provided by Assistant Cit y Counselor Myles D. McDonnell in his Response to the Court Pursuant to the City of St. Louis Waiver Agreement. [Doc. # 59 ]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis inthis action, service shall be effectuated by the United States Marshals Office through summons, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of the summons and the return of summonsshall be filed under seal and will not be served upon plaintiff, as these documents will contain defendant Houses last known home address.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/19/2018. (AAS)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED defense counsel shall file with the Court, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, a notice stating whether counsel will waive service on behalf of defendant Unknown House. If counsel is able to wai ve service on behalf of defendant Unknown House, an answer shall be filed on behalf of defendant Unknown House within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if counsel is unable to waive service on be half of defendant Unknown House, defense counsel shall provide the Court, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the last known address of defendant Unknown House, ex parte and under seal.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent defense counsel has no record of employment for defendant Unknown House, he shall notify the Court forthwith. Response to Court due by 10/6/2018.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 09/26/2018. (AAS)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the Court with adequate information such that Sonya White may be served with process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in th e absence of good cause shown, plaintiffs failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of Sonya White from this cause of action, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Response to Court due by 10/15/2018. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/24/18. (CLA)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the Court with adequate information such that Sonya Tate may be served with process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the ab sence of good cause shown, plaintiffs failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of Sonya Tate from this cause of action, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Response to Court due by 10/8/2018.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/17/18. (KJS)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the Court with adequate information such that Marco Sturdivant may be served with process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in t he absence of good cause shown, plaintiff's failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of Marco Sturdivant from this cause of action, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on August 14, 2018. (BRP)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the Court with adequate information such that Betty Love and Haniyyah Shields may be served with process. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that, in the absence of good cause shown, plaintiff's failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of Betty Love and Haniyyah Shields from this cause of action, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on July 17, 2018. (BRP)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's request for the Court to serve process on one Terence or Terrence Miller [Doc. # 38 ] is DENIED at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 6/13/2018. (CLO)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall provide the Court with adequate information such that defendants Shawn Robinson,Tiffany Smith and Unknown Miller may be served with process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the absence of good cause shown, plaintiff's failure to timely respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of Shawn Robinson, Tiffany Smith and Unknown Miller from this cause of action, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 4/19/18. (KXS)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 19 ] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time [Doc. # 21 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on March 27, 2018. (BRP)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 17 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on February 6, 2018. (BRP)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $23.25 within thirty (30) days of the date of th is Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original pro ceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue proces s or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Correctional Officer Shawn Robinson; Lieutenant Sonya White; Correctional Officer Unknown Sturdivant; Lieutenant Unknown Love; Correctional Officer Unknown House; Correctional Office Unk nown Gayden; Correctional Officer Toriano Tate; Correctional Officer Tiffany Smith; Correctional Office Unknown Shields; Correctional Officer Unknown Goodwin; Correctional Officer Unknown Miller. Defendants shall be served pursuant to the Waiver of S ervice Agreement this Court maintains with the St. Louis City Counselors Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provis ions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official capacity claims against defendants are subject to dismissal because these claims fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no process shall issue on Major Unknown Mitchell because plaintiffs claims against him fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5: Prisoner Standard.An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. 2 ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/5/2017.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/5/17. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Martel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toriano Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?