Zeigenbein v. Howell et al
Plaintiff: Louis Neal Zeigenbein
Defendant: Eric Jones, Warren Howard, Ruane Stamps and Sgt. Ipoc
Case Number: 4:2017cv02749
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to compel is DENIED without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 37-3.04(A). ECF No. 64 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/9/19. (KXS)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Sergeant Ipoc's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. [ECF No. 14 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Warren Howard and Eric Jones' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [ECF No. [1 3]] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to supplement and motions to accept relevant evidence are DENIED. [ECF Nos. 17 , 25 , 30 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice. [ECF No. 19 ] A partial judgment will accompany this memorandum and order. The Court is also entering a separate case management order today. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 31, 2018. (BRP)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. 2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $26.36 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney Generals Office, as to defendants Eric Jones, Warren Howard, and Sergeant Ipoc in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with Corizon, as to Dr. Ruanne Stamps in her individual capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Steve Howell, Tiffany Breeden, Mr. Coatney, Laurel Davison, Tere na Ballinger, and John Scott because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. Plaintiffs claims against these defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims brought against all defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. [ECF No. 3 ]. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/04/2017. (KCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeigenbein v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Neal Zeigenbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Jones
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Howard
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruane Stamps
Represented By: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ipoc
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?