Payne Family Homes, LLC v. Survant Air Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Payne Family Homes, LLC
Defendant: Survant Air Systems, Inc., Trustees of the Sheet Metal Local 36 Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Sheet Metal Local 36 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sheet Metal Local 36 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the St. Louis Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers' Local 36 401(k) Plan, Trustees of the St. Louis Metal Working Industry Fund, International Association of Sheet Mail, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers ("Smart") Local Union No. 36, Trane U.S., Inc., Capitol Group, Inc. and U.S. Department of Revenue -- Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2017cv02912
Filed: December 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than Friday, December 28, 2018, the United States shall file a proposed order for disbursement of the fund in accordance with E.D. Mo. L.R. 13.04 (C)(3). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/19/18. (JAB)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that United States' Motion for Summary Judgment 57 is GRANTED as to Defendant Trane U.S. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs 34 is DENIED. A separate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Trane's cross-claim and third-party petition remain set for a non-jury trial on January14, 2019.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/14/18. (KKS)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion by United States, Capitol Group, Inc., and the Funds to Determine Priority 55 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment 57 is GRA NTED as to Defendants Capitol Group, Inc. and the Funds. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant Trane U.S., Inc., shall file its response to the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment no later than Friday, October 5, 2018. Any reply shall be filed no later than Monday, October 15, 2018. ( Response to Court due by 10/5/2018.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/26/18. (KKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne Family Homes, LLC v. Survant Air Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survant Air Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Sheet Metal Local 36 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Sheet Metal Local 36 Pension Fund
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Sheet Metal Local 36 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the St. Louis Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers' Local 36 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the St. Louis Metal Working Industry Fund
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Mail, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers ("Smart") Local Union No. 36
Represented By: Christopher N. Grant
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Kasperek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Group, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Christofferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Revenue -- Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Samuel Peter Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payne Family Homes, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Coffman
Represented By: John B. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?