Steak N Shake Inc. v. White
Plaintiff: Steak N Shake Inc.
Defendant: Melissa White
Case Number: 4:2018cv00072
Filed: January 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits #7 and 8 are overruled in part and sustained in part. Plaintiff's Exhibit 8 will be admitted for the limited purpose of showing the volum e of public commentary in response to Defendant's Facebook post. Plaintiff's Exhibit 7 will only be admitted upon a showing that each out-of- court statement falls within an exception to the rule against hearsay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3 is granted in part. Any third-party statements from Ms. Whites Facebook account that do not fall within an exception to the hearsay rule and are offered for their truth will be excluded. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/14/2020. (CLO)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Steak N Shake's Motion to Exclude the report, opinions, and testimony of Dr. Catherine Hutt, Doc. 77 , is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as set forth above.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Steak N Shake's Motion to Exclude to report, opinions, and testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Tomberlin, Doc. 79 , is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Steak N Shake's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaims, Doc . 94 , is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Melissa White's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, Doc. 118 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Steak N Shake's Partial Motion to Strike, Doc. 116 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/7/2020. (CLO)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Melissa White's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatory and Request for Admissions 69 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/30/2019. (CLO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steak N Shake Inc. v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steak N Shake Inc.
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Jennifer C. Znosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa White
Represented By: Samuel Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?