Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, et al., v. Neidorff et al
Plaintiff: Harkishan Parekh, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Laura Wood, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund and Peoria Police Pension Fund
Defendant: Michael F Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, Centene Corporation, John R. Roberts, Richard A. Gephardt, Pamela A. Joseph, David L. Steward, Frederick H. Eppinger, Robert K. Ditmore, K. Rone Baldwin, Michael F. Neidorff, Tommy G. Thompson, Carol E. Goldman, Orlando Ayala and Vicki B. Escarra
Case Number: 4:2018cv00113
Filed: January 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Docket Text ORDER Re: #68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Zachary M. Faigen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached. by Defendant Centene Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Faigen, Zachary); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/3/2019. (BRP)
October 2, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Zachary M. Faigen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7497611) by Defendant Centene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Faigen, Zachary)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #65 MOTION to Lift Stay ; ORDERED GRANTED; the stay of the case is VACATED and the parties' proposed briefing schedule #66 is adopted. Motion to dismiss due 45 days from today, opposition brief due 45 days thereafter, any reply brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/16/19. (CDP)
September 13, 2019 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Berelovich, Eric)
September 13, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Lift Stay by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berelovich, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Centene Corporation's Motion to Stay this Action Pending Resolution of Sanchez, et al. v. Centene Corp., et al. #55 is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is stayed pending resolution of the motion to dismiss now under submission in Sanchez. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the court's ruling of the motion to dismiss in Sanchez, counsel for the parties in this derivative action shall meet and confer and file an appropriate motion to lift the stay and a joint status report setting out what effect, if any, the court's ruling in Sanchez has on the claims now pending in this action, including whether the operative consolidated complaint now pending in this action will or should be further amended and, if so, when. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on July 11, 2019. (BRP)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
March 18, 2019 Filing 63 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Centene Corporation re #62 Reply to Response to Motion (Supplemental Declaration in Support of #55 Motion to Stay). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - Poehling v UnitedHealth Group Dkt 171, #2 Exhibit H - Klein v Brock Dkt 22)(Smith, Christopher)
March 18, 2019 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Resolution of Sanchez v. Centene Corp., et al. filed by Defendant Centene Corporation. (Smith, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 61 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R. Jacobsen for Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Jacobsen, Scott)
March 11, 2019 Filing 60 ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Johnson for Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 59 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood re #58 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Form 10-K Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - In re Yahoo! Inc.)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
March 6, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Resolution of Sanchez v. Centene Corp., et al. filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 57 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Centene Corporation re #55 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Resolution of Sanchez v. Centene Corp., et al., #56 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration of Christopher A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Centene Securities Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Dkt 071-72 Motion to Dismiss and Memo, #3 Exhibit C - Chiu v. Dipp, #4 Exhibit D - Order re Galustyan v. Sather, #5 Exhibit E - Granted Stip re In re China Integrated Energy Inc., et al., #6 Exhibit F - Granted Stip re In re Ebix, Inc.)(Morrison, Peter)
February 22, 2019 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #55 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Resolution of Sanchez v. Centene Corp., et al. filed by Defendant Centene Corporation. (Morrison, Peter)
February 22, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Resolution of Sanchez v. Centene Corp., et al. by Defendant Centene Corporation (Oral Argument Requested). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Peter)
February 12, 2019 Filing 54 SUPPLEMENTAL re #53 Amended Complaint, Verification of Peoria Police Pension Fund by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson , filed by Peoria Police Pension Fund, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Laura Wood.(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #49 Joint Motion for Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay and Responsive Pleadings filed by Orlando Ayala, David L. Steward, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Frederick H. Eppinger, Michael F. Neidorff, Centene Corporation, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, Robert K. Ditmore, Vicki B. Escarra, Tommy G. Thompson, John R. Roberts, K. Rone Baldwin, Pamela A. Joseph. Ordered: Motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 7, 2019. (MCB)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #46 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Verified Consolidated Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. ORDERED: Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall forthwith file a redacted version in the public file, and the Consolidated Amended Complaint is deemed filed today. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 7, 2019. (MCB)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+ScottJoint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+Scott filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. ORDERED: Motion is GRANTED. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 7, 2019. (MCB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 49 STIPULATION - Joint Motion For Order Setting Briefing Schedule On Motion To Stay And Responsive Pleading by Defendants Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Peter)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Winston P. Hsiao by Defendant Centene Corporation, Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward and Tommy G. Thomspon and #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter B. Morrison by Defendant Centene Corporation, Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward and Tommy G. Thomspon ; ORDERED :Motion are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 6, 2019. (MCB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT re #46 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Verified Consolidated Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Verified Consolidated Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood of Filing of Proposed Verified Consolidated Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Court Order (Attachments: #1 Verified Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+ScottJoint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+Scott filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
February 5, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Winston P. Hsiao. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7021276) by Defendant Centene Corporation, Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward and Tommy G. Thomspon . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hsiao, Winston) Modified on 2/6/2019 (MCB).
February 5, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter B. Morrison. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7021107) by Defendant Centene Corporation, Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward and Tommy G. Thomspon . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Morrison, Peter) Modified on 2/6/2019 (MCB).
January 29, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+ScottJoint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+Scott filed by Defendant Centene Corporation. (Smith, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood re #39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+ScottJoint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+Scott . (Attachments: #1 Cohen Milstein Firm Resume, #2 Scott+Scott Firm Resume, #3 Robbins Arroyo Firm Resume)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
January 22, 2019 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , and Lead Plaintiff, names:Cohen Milstein and Scott+Scott by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #37 Joint MOTION for Extension , Unopposed, of: Scheduling Order; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/18/19. (CDP)
January 18, 2019 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension , Unopposed, of: Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard A. Speirs by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund ; ORDERED: Motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on January 14, 2019. (MCB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard A. Speirs. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6971473) by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Speirs Certificate of Good Standing)(Speirs, Richard)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois and Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund's Motion to Consolidate and Amend Scheduling Order #30 is granted in all respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, et al. v. Neidorff, et al., Case No. 4:18CV2085 RLW, is consolidated into this action for all purposes. All further filings shall be filed in Case No. 4:18CV113 CDP only. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close Case No. 4:18CV2085 RLW after docketing a copy of this Order in that case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule #29 is amended to specifically include and apply in all respects to counsel for plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois and Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. Competing plaintiffs' counsel are granted to January 16, 2019, by which to meet and confer and attempt to resolve their competing claims to be lead plaintiff and lead counsel. In all other respects, the schedule, conditions, and deadlines set out in the Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule remain in full force and effect. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/9/2019. (CBL)
December 31, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Amend Scheduling Order Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-02085 filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Amend Scheduling Order Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-02085 filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
December 26, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Amend Scheduling Order Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-02085 filed by Defendants Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Smith, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Amend Scheduling Order Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-02085 by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING PLEADING AND MOTION SCHEDULE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule #26 is GRANTED as follows: 1. Defendants are not required to move against, answer or otherwise respond to either of the complaints at this time. 2. No later than January 11, 2019, counsel for plaintiff Harkishan Parekh and for plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund must meet and confer and attempt to resolve their competing claims to be lead plaintiff and lead counsel. a. If they can agree, they must, no later than January 22, 2019 file a joint motion for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel, setting out any agreement and why that is an appropriate resolution of this initial dispute, and setting out which of the two complaints should become the operative complaint in this matter or whether they agree to file a consolidated amended complaint. Any proposed consolidated amended complaint must be attached to the joint motion. b. Assuming no agreement is reached, then each plaintiff group must, no later than January 22, 2019, file a single motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and lead counsel and a statement whether, if that side is appointed lead plaintiff/counsel, they wish to proceed on their previously-filed complaint or wish to file an amended complaint. If they wish to file an amended complaint, the proposed amended complaint must be attached to that motion. Each side must also, by that same date, file a memorandum in support of its position, along with any declarations or other evidence it deems appropriate. The memoranda in support are limited to 20 pages each and must cover all issues (lead plaintiff, lead counsel, amendment) in that sides single memorandum. No later than February 13, 2019 the competing plaintiffs must file any briefs in opposition, which are limited to 15 pages in length. Any reply briefs must be filed no later than March 1, 2019 and are limited to 5 pages in length. These page limitations will not be extended. 3. If counsel believe any of this material should be filed under seal or should not be provided to any other party in the case, they must meet and confer with all counsel and seek to reach agreement for an appropriate protective order. If they are unable to agree, then they must file a joint motion for a protective order setting out the position of each party to the case no later than January 22, 2019. No further briefing will be allowed on the protective-order issue. 4. Defendants shall have 45 days after the Court Order resolving the issues of lead plaintiff, lead counsel and operative complaint, to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. 5. If defendants move to dismiss the complaint, lead plaintiff shall file its opposition no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. 6. Defendants shall file their reply to any opposition made by lead plaintiff no later than 30 days after the filing of lead plaintiff's opposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further briefs and pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 4:18CV113 CDP only, and the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close Case No. 4:18CV393 CDP, after docketing a copy of this order in that case. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/13/2018. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00113-CDP, 4:18-cv-00393-CDP(CBL)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Movants Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Appoint Lead Counsel (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate Case Number 4:18-cv-00393-CDP into Case Number 4:18-cv-00113-NAB. Following such consolidation, the Clerk is ordered to reassign the consolidated case to District Judge Catherine D. Perry, who has agreed to such reassignment. (Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker no longer assigned to case.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/7/18. (KJS)
April 17, 2018 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P. Conran for Defendants Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Conran, Joseph)
April 17, 2018 Filing 26 JOINT MOTION for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule by Defendants Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson, Movants Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher) (**Court has changed this from a non-motion "stipulation" to a "motion" event.) Modified on 4/18/2018 (KJS).
April 17, 2018 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Centene Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Smith, Christopher)
April 17, 2018 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith for Defendants Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Smith, Christopher)
April 11, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 filed by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh. (Neill, Joseph)
April 4, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood re #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY M. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF WOOD & PEORIAS MEMORANDUM OF LAW (1) IN OPPOSITION TO HARKISHAN PAREKHS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL; AND (2) REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF WOOD & PEORIAS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFFS, AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Transcript of Tansy v Good hearing))(Johnson, Geoffrey)
April 4, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 MEMORANDUM OF LAW (1) IN OPPOSITION TO HARKISHAN PAREKHS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL; AND (2) REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF WOOD & PEORIAS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFFS, AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Stephen J. Oddo is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/29/2018. (GGB)
March 28, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh re #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2 & 3)(Neill, Joseph)
March 28, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 filed by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh. (Neill, Joseph)
March 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh. (Neill, Joseph) .
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Consolidate is ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 28, 2018 to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on March 28, 2018.(HEH)
March 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen J. Oddo. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6454377) by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Cert of Standing from CA State Bar)(Oddo, Stephen)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to strike Wood and the Fund as plaintiffs in this action and enter them as movants. (Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund added as Movants. Peoria Police Pension Fund and Laura Wood terminated as Plaintiffs.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/27/18. (KJS)
March 23, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO WOOD & PEORIA'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFFS, AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh. (Neill, Joseph)
March 22, 2018 Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Due to clerk's error, the above captioned case was mistakenly reassigned to the Honorable Catherine D. Perry. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is returned to the docket of the Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (KXS)
March 22, 2018 Filing 11 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (CLA)
March 20, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2018. (KJS)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT HEREBY ORDERED that for good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Wood & Peoria's Motion to Consolidate the Related Actions, Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Appoint Lead Counsel [Doc. 7], pursuant to Local Rule 13.05, is ORDERED GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Memorandum in Support of the motion [Doc. 8] is SEALED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on March 14, 2018. (HEH)
March 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 (proposed order) (Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate etc.) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate etc.) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutzler, Greg) Modified on 3/15/2018 (AAS).
March 9, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 . (Attachments: #1 Ex A Parekh Complaint, #2 Ex B Scott+Scott Firm Resume, #3 Ex C EGS Firm Resume)(Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 (redacted version) filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 by Plaintiffs Laura Wood, Peoria Police Pension Fund. (Gutzler, Greg)
February 15, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/22/2018. (KJS)
January 26, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 25, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 14 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Joseph Neill. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (JWD)
January 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh (Neill, Joseph)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6347162, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Harkishan Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Neill, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, et al., v. Neidorff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F Neidorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Zachary Faigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Roberts
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Gephardt
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Joseph
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Steward
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick H. Eppinger
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Ditmore
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Rone Baldwin
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Neidorff
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy G. Thompson
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol E. Goldman
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Ayala
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki B. Escarra
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harkishan Parekh
Represented By: Joseph V. Neill
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Represented By: Richard A. Speirs
Represented By: Carol Valerie Gilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wood
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Represented By: Richard A. Speirs
Represented By: Carol Valerie Gilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoria Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?