Watson v. Driskill et al
Plaintiff: Pierre Watson
Defendant: Zachary Driskill, Jessica Hanner, Diane Manley, Kevin Brown, John Hendrichs, Matthew Unknown, Tammy Unknown and Institution Doctor unknown
Case Number: 4:2018cv00764
Filed: May 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Nannette A. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to voluntarily dismiss his claim against defendant Diane Manley (Docket No. 80 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claim against defendant Diane Manley is DISMIS SED without prejudice. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to supplement his reply (Docket No. 79 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/8/20. (KJS)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall provide adequate information with which to serve defendant Diane Manley.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs failure to timely provide adequate information as to defendant Diane Manley will result in her dismissal from this case without prejudice. Response to Court due by 9/13/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 08/14/2020. (AAT)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Docket No. 65) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to "make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for the appeal of the instant action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on May 4, 2020. (MCB)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, either pay the full $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that if plaintiff files a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, he must provide a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Motio n to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases form. period immediately preceding the filing of the notice of appeal. (cc: mailed the plaintiff a copy of the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases form this day) Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/27/2020. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/27/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 04/27/2020. (AAT)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue on defendants Jessica Hanner and Diane Manley in their individual capacities as to plaintiffs failure to protect claim at the addresse s provided by defense counsel in Docket Number 54. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, service shall be effectuated by the United States Marshals Office through summons pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that copies of the summonses and the return of summonses shall be filed under seal and will not be served upon plaintiff, as these documents will contain the last known residential addresses of defendants Hanner and Manley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/13/20. (EAB)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Remington Smith shall submit, under seal and ex parte, the last known residential addresses for Jessica Hanner and Diane Manley, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on March 5, 2020. (MCB)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to reconsider (Docket No. 41 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 1/28/2020. (CBL)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to obtain electronically stored information (Docket No. 39) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on January 22, 2020. (MCB)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 27; Docket No. 30) are DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue on defendants Zachary Driskill, Jessica Hanner, and Diane Manley in their individual capacities as to plaintiff's claim of failure to protect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official capacity claims against all defendant s are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's individual capacity claims against defendants Michelle Unknown and Unknown Fulh are DISMISSED without pr ejudice for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs individual capacity claims against defendants Zachary Driskill, Jessica Hanner, and Diane Manley are DISMISSED without prejudice for fa ilure to state a claim, with the exception of Plaintiffs claim of failure to protect. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on January 13, 2020. (MCB)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time in which to file his amended complaint (Docket No. 24) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on a Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth in the Courts order of August 27, 2018, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of th is case without prejudice and without further notice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will review it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 6/12/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 05/13/2019. (AAS)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time in which to file his amended complaint (Docket No. 19 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on a Court-pr ovided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth in the Court's order of August 27, 2018, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this order will r esult in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will review the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/14/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on March 15, 2019. (BRP)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs second motion for extension of time in which to file his amended complaint and pay the initial partial filing fee (Docket No. 14 ) is GRANTED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff m ust pay an initial partial filing fee of $37.92 within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his p rison registration number; (3) this case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff is unable to pay the initial partial filing fee, he must provide the Court with an updat ed certified inmate account statement so that his initial partial filing fee can be recalculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form, in accordance w ith the instructions set forth in the Courts order of August 27, 2018, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights form.I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of his original complaint (Docket No. 1 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the Courts August 27, 2018 order (Docket No. 11 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will review the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (cc: plaintiff a copy of the prisoner civil rights form, complaint 1 , and order 11 ) ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/25/2019., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 1/25/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/11/2018. (AAS)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time in which to pay the initial partial filing fee and file his amended complaint (Docket No. 12 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an i nitial partial filing fee of $37.92 within ninety (90) days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registr ation number; (3) this case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set f orth in the Courts previous order, within ninety (90) days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will review the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Plaintiffs f ailure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice.(Amended Complaint due by 12/19/2018. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 12/19/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 9/20/18. (KJS)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $37.92 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Or der. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an ori ginal proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 5) is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to amend his complaint by interlineation (Docket No. 8) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the original complaint (Docket No. 1) that was filed with this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth above, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will review the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. 2 5 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Plaintiff Pierre Watson ( Response to Court due by 9/27/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/27/18. cc: civil right form/copy of complaint mailed.(CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Driskill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hendrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institution Doctor unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?