TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC
Counter Claimant: KEITH BOWMAN
Counter Defendant: TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01056
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)
June 29, 2018 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00034. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
June 29, 2018 Filing 27 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Missouri. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Missouri, on June 29, 2018. (JRB)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENTRY ON CLAIMANT'S #17 MOTION TO DISMISS - Bowman's Motion to Dismiss #17 is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Specifically, the court DENIES Bowman's motion to dismiss TPG's Limitation Action outright. The court GRANTS Bowman's motion to transfer the case to the Eastern District of Missouri. The court's Order issued on March 9, 2018, shall remain in effect3 unless and until otherwise ruled on. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. SEE ENTRY. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/29/2018.(JRB)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 02:30 PM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/21/2018.(JRB)
May 14, 2018 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support Reply in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss TPG Mt. Vernon Marine LLC's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 12(b)(3) Brief in Support of Keith Bowman's Reply to TPG MT. VERNON MARINE LLC's Response to Keith Bowman's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Claimant KEITH BOWMAN. (Sullivan, Dennis)
May 14, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss TPG Mt. Vernon Marine LLC's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 12(b)(3) Claimant Keith Bowman's Reply to TPG MT. VERNON MARINE LLC's Response to Keith Bowman's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Claimant KEITH BOWMAN. (Sullivan, Dennis)
May 8, 2018 Filing 22 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss TPG Mt. Vernon Marine LLC's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 12(b)(3) , filed by In Re TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss filed in 22nd Judicial Circuit of Missouri)(Fox, Ronald)
May 8, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss TPG Mt. Vernon Marine LLC's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 12(b)(3) , filed by In Re TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Fox, Ronald)
April 26, 2018 Filing 20 Answer and Claims of Keith Bowman ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC, filed by KEITH BOWMAN.(Sullivan, Dennis)
April 25, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT by Publisher (Proof of Publication) by TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Fox, Ronald)
April 25, 2018 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss TPG Mt. Vernon Marine LLC's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 12(b)(3) , filed by Claimant KEITH BOWMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sullivan, Dennis)
April 25, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss TPG Mt. Vernon Marine LLC's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 12(b)(3), filed by Claimant KEITH BOWMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Dennis)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Dennis J. Sullivan for KEITH BOWMAN added - Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/19/2018. (JRB)
April 18, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dennis J. Sullivan to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $$100.00, receipt number IP060118), filed by Claimant KEITH BOWMAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(JRB)
April 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Pleadings for Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, filed by In Re TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service) (Fox, Ronald)
April 2, 2018 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL ENTRY REGARDING PUBLISHING - This entry confirms that the Plaintiff is to publish the Notice in the Court and Commercial Record, not the Clerk of the court. SEE ENTRY. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/2/2018.(JRB)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING #3 SECURITY FOR VALUE, APPROVING STIPULATION FOR COSTS, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE, AND RESTRAINING SUITS - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/9/2018.(JRB)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stanislav Levchinsky for TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC added - Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/26/2018. (JRB)
February 23, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Fox, Ronald)
February 23, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stanislav Levchinsky to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number EV006081), filed by In Re TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(JRB)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ronald E. Fox to Appear pro hac vice - Copy sent to Counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/21/2018. (JRB)
February 20, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald E. Fox to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4759256), filed by Plaintiff TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ronald E. Fox, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Fox, Ronald)
February 16, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Order re #3 Stipulation for Costs and Security filed by Plaintiff TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Van Haaften, W.) Modified on 2/20/2018 (JRB).
February 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Limitation Complaint, filed by Plaintiff TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC (Van Haaften, W.)
February 16, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Costs, filed by Plaintiff TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Van Haaften, W.)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Trent Van Haaften on behalf of Plaintiff TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Van Haaften, W.)
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC, filed by TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4758425) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Merrill, #2 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Haaften, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: KEITH BOWMAN
Represented By: Dennis J. Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: TPG MT. VERNON MARINE, LLC
Represented By: Ronald E. Fox
Represented By: W. Trent Van Haaften
Represented By: Stanislav Levchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?