United States of America v. $179,900.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $179,900.00 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari and Nader Ghanaat
Case Number: 4:2018cv01268
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 22 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted directed to party: Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari, Type of return: Complaint & Notice [US Marshal Service Remarks: 8/8/18 Mailed Certified 9/11/18 Returned Unclaimed] (MRC)
September 12, 2018 Filing 21 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted directed to party : Sadeghi Family Trust 2012,c/o Nadaar Ghanaat, Type of return: Complaint & Notice [US Marshal Service Remarks: 8/8/18 Mailed Certified 9/11/18 Returned Unclaimed. (MRC)
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Stephen)[Attorney filing error. Document filed is not for this case. Attorney notified of the filing error and instructed to re-file this document appropriately. This document has been deleted from case 4:18cv1268 CAS. NEF regenerated. Modified on 9/11/2018 (MRC).]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall provide the Court with a paper courtesy copy of the Motion to Dismiss and the Response thereto, as required by the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. See http://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/judges/requirements/cas.pdf. Delivery may be made by regular mail or by hand delivery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that for all future filings, the parties shall comply with Section II.F. of the Court's Administrative Procedures for CM/ECF, and the instructions that appear in red text on the CM/ECF filing screens, by labeling each exhibit to any filed document with both an exhibit designation and a brief description of the exhibit. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on September 11, 2018. (SMH)
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case and For Return of Property Under Rule 41(g) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Casey, Stephen)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #16 , unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Special Interrogatories, filed by Claimants Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari and Nader Ghanaat; ORDERED GRANTED. Claimants shall respond to the Special Interrogatories by October 10, 2018. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on September 11, 2018. (SMH)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Special Interrogatories (Unopposed) by Claimants Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari, Nader Ghanaat. (Mueller, William)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case and For Return of Property Under Rule 41(g) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Claimant Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Casey, Stephen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Verified Complaint of Forfeiture by Nader Ghanaat.(Mueller, William)
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Verified Complaint of Forfeiture by Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari.(Mueller, William)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: John P. Rogers, Esq., Type of return: Complaint & Notice, [US Marshal Service Remarks: 8/8/2018 Mailed Certified #941486902246689800175 8/11/2018 Delivered (MRC)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served: W. David Mueller, Esq., Type of return: Complaint & Notice. [US Marshal Service Remarks: 8/8/18 Mailed Cert #9414816902246689800199. 8/11/18 Delivered (MRC)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 CLAIM to the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture filed by claimant Nader Ghanaat re Complaint, #1 (Mueller, William) [Attorney filing error. Case manager has: Added the claimant to the record and modified the Docket Text. Spelling of claimant's first name corrected. Modified on 8/17/2018 (MRC).]
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 CLAIM to the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture filed by claimant Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari re Complaint, #1 . (Mueller, William) [Attorney filing error. Case manager has: Added claimant to the record and modified the Docket Text. Modified on 8/17/2018 (MRC).]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Documents 3 and 4, filed as Notices, are STRICKEN from the record for filing error. The wrong civil filing event was used and as a result the claimants and their attorney have not been made a part of the Court record. The claimants must refile their Verified Claims using the correct filing event. Claimants' counsel shall contact the Court's case manager at 314-244-7921 for instructions prior to refiling the Verified Claims. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on August 17, 2018. (SMH)
August 17, 2018 ***REMARK - William Mueller, attorney for claimants, contacted by phone and advised of the Court's Docket Text Order no. 7. (MRC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service for Nadaar Ghanaat, trustee of Sadeghi Family Trust 2012: by Plaintiff United States of America (Casey, Stephen)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service for Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari: by Plaintiff United States of America (Casey, Stephen)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 [STRICKEN-see Docket Text Order no. 7] NOTICE Verified Claim to the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture: by Defendant $179,900.00 U.S. Currency (Mueller, William) Modified on 8/17/2018 (MRC).
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 [STRICKEN-see Docket Text Order no. 7] NOTICE Verified Claim to the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture: by Defendant $179,900.00 U.S. Currency (Mueller, William) Modified on 8/17/2018 (MRC).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed as to $179,900.00 U.S. Currency Type of return: Complaint & Warrant,[US Marshal Service remarks: 4/16/18-USMS Custody 8/8/18-Complaint & Warrant served on asset] (MRC)
August 1, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant$179,900.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK)
August 1, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $179,900.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Casey, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2018: #3 Warrant) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $179,900.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $179,900.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Davoud Sadeghi Abandansari
Represented By: William David Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nader Ghanaat
Represented By: William David Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?