Mantel v. Par Broadcasting Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Marshall Mantel
Defendant: Par Broadcasting Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01430
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall file, no later than March 1, 2019, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions (Doc. #5 ) are denied without prejudice as moot. ( Dismissal Paper(s) due by 3/1/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/10/18. (KKS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by John Marshall Mantel (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 26, 2018 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff John Marshall Mantel to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Transfer Venue by Defendant Par Broadcasting Company, Inc.. (Miller, Trentis) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (CLO).
September 17, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff John Marshall Mantel to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Par Broadcasting Company, Inc.. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Liebowitz. (JWD)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff John Marshall Mantel Process Server: D & B Legal Services (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 28, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (JWD)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (JWD)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Par Broadcasting Company, Inc. with receipt number 0865-6718465, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by John Marshall Mantel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mantel v. Par Broadcasting Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Broadcasting Company, Inc.
Represented By: Trentis Eugene Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Marshall Mantel
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?