Woods v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Vinetta Woods
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv01431
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Vinetta Woods. Office of Regional Counsel served on 9/10/18. (KXS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Vinetta Woods. US Attorney General served on 9/12/18. (KXS)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Vinetta Woods. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (CBL)
August 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to the US Marshal for service. (EAB)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 4:Social Security Appeal. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/28/18. (EAB)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/28/18. (EAB)
August 28, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (JWD)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Vinetta Woods. (JWD)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Vinetta Woods. (Overton, Kathleen)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Vinetta Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons Office of Regional Counsel, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinetta Woods
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?