Yang v. BlackSportsOnline, LLC
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Defendant: BlackSportsOnline, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01438
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Stephen Yang. BlackSportsOnline, LLC served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (BAK)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Stephen Yang Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant BlackSportsOnline, LLC with receipt number 0865-6720934, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Stephen Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. BlackSportsOnline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackSportsOnline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?