Drace v. Drace et al

Plaintiff: Robert C Drace and Robert C. Drace
Respondent: Robert J Armbruster, Inc, Deborah L Drace, Deborah L. Drace and Robert J. Ambruster, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01452
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Robert C. Drace. (Luce, David)
October 15, 2018 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Respondent Deborah L. Drace. (George, Michael)
October 15, 2018 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Respondent Deborah L. Drace. (George, Michael)
October 15, 2018 11 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court , #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Respondent Deborah L. Drace. (George, Michael) filed by Deborah L. Drace ; GRANTED( Response to Court due by 10/15/2018.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/15/2018. (AAS)
October 12, 2018 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court , #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Respondent Deborah L. Drace. (George, Michael)
October 1, 2018 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Respondent Robert J. Ambruster, Inc.. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Cole, James)
September 28, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Robert C. Drace. (Luce, David)
September 28, 2018 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Robert C. Drace. (Luce, David)
September 28, 2018 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Respondent Robert J. Ambruster, Inc.. (Cole, James)
September 28, 2018 5 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Respondent Robert J. Ambruster, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate certificate and annual report, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment 3-1-2016, #3 Exhibit C - Order Dismissing Appeal, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment for Sanctions, #5 Exhibit E - Order Enforcing Settlement, #6 Exhibit F - Duree Judgment, #7 Exhibit G - Federal dismissal order, #8 Exhibit H - State Court docket sheet, #9 Exhibit I - RJA Mot Equit Lien)(Cole, James)
August 30, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
August 29, 2018 4 SUPPLEMENTAL Circuit Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
August 29, 2018 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Respondent Deborah L. Drace Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
August 29, 2018 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Robert C. Drace.(MFG)
August 29, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Cout of St. Louis County Stat of Missouri, case number 18SL-PR01136, with receipt number 0865-6723371, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Deborah L Drace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit State Court Case File, #4 Exhibit Notice to Circuit Court of Removal, #5 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff of Removal)(George, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drace v. Drace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert J Armbruster, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah L Drace
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah L. Drace
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert J. Ambruster, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Cole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Drace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Drace
Represented By: David H. Luce
Represented By: Stephen Mark Hoeplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?