Wolman v. Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Baron Wolman
Defendant: Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2018cv01483
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Baron Wolman (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/2/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/9/2018 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on October 9, 2018. (MCB)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. (KCB)
September 28, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated and Plaintiff Baron Wolman to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (AFC)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Martineau, Joseph)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated.(Martineau, Joseph)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendant Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated. (Martineau, Joseph)
September 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Richard Paul Liebowitz. (MFG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Baron Wolman Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 5, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated with receipt number 0865-6731747, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Baron Wolman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolman v. Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baron Wolman
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises Missouri, Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?