Wild v. Richardson Pest Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander L Wild and Alexander L. Wild
Defendant: Charles T. Richardson and Richardson Pest Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01490
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alexander L. Wild. Charles T. Richardson served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Voytas, Richard)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alexander L. Wild. Richardson Pest Solutions, LLC served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Voytas, Richard)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff Alexander L. Wild. (Voytas, Richard)
September 6, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Richard A. Voytas, Jr.. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Alexander L Wild Process Server: Mark Effinger of Associated Research Services, LLC (Voytas, Richard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Charles T. Richardson, Richardson Pest Solutions, LLC with receipt number 0865-6736446, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Alexander L Wild. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Form Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate, #5 Summons Summons to Richardson Pest Solutions LLC, #6 Summons Summons to Charles T. Richardson)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. Richardson Pest Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson Pest Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander L Wild
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander L. Wild
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?