United States of America v. $195,005.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $195,005.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2018cv01501
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 MARSHAL Return Executed party served E. Alexander DeSalvo, Esq, Type of return complaint & notice. (JMC)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Verified Claim by Defendant $195,005.00 U.S. Currency. (DeSalvo, E.) filed by $195,005.00 U.S. Currency ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/17/18. ANSWER DUE 12/19/18.(MRS)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice E Alexander DeSalvo. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6817443) by Defendant $195,005.00 U.S. Currency. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DeSalvo, E.) filed by $195,005.00 U.S. Currency ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/17/18. (MRS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Verified Claim by Defendant $195,005.00 U.S. Currency. (DeSalvo, E.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice E Alexander DeSalvo. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6817443) by Defendant $195,005.00 U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DeSalvo, E.)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return executed party served Christopher Worley, Type of return Notice of Forfeiture, Mailed Certified (MRS)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return executed Type of return Forfeiture Complaint and Warrant, on U S Currency(MRS)
September 10, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
September 10, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant$195,005.00 U.S. Currency. (MFG)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $195,005.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $195,005.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $195,005.00 U.S. Currency
Represented By: E. Alexander DeSalvo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?