Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri et al

Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: St. Louis Pipeline Corporation, Mississippi River Transmission Corporation, 0.06 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, St. Louis Water Company, 0.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Richard Hoelscher, Collector of Revenue of St. Louis County, Shirley Hoelscher, Metropolitan Park and Recreation District, 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri, Metropolitant St. Louis Sewer District, Trust for Public Land, a Non-Profit California Corporation and Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Case Number: 4:2018cv01523
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
0 Judge: David D Noce
1 Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case and all associated cases listed below are referred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce for a report and recommendation on dispositive matters and for rulings on non-dispositive matters. All documents filed in this matter shall include the district and magistrate judges' initials (RWS/DDN). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall be filed in each of the following cases: (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/1/18. (KXS)
October 30, 2018 7 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (KXS)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion for consolidation (Doc. 3) is GRANTED, in that the Clerk is ORDERED to reassign the following cases to the undersigned and consolidate them with the instant case for all purposes: (see order). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order of Consolidation be filed in each of the above cases, as well as the instant case, and that all future documents be filed in the instant case, 4: 18 CV 1327 DDN. Each of the above cases shall be administratively closed and no further filings will be accepted in those closed cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motions to extend filed in the above cases be denied as moot before consolidation and closure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, once all cases have been reassigned to Magistrate judge David D. Noce in 4:18 CV 1327 DDN, the Clerk of Court will issue a Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form to any parties who have not yet received one. Those parties who have not yet had the opportunity to file their option for a United States District Judge or for consent to the authority of a United States Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636 must submit their completed consent forms (available online) within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the reassignment of the consolidated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/10/18. (KXS)
September 12, 2018 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). At the direction of the Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce pursuant to the Memorandum and Order of Consolidation filed on September 10, 2018, in 4:18cv1327 DDN : (see order for case numbers). (KXS)
September 12, 2018 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC.. (Sonderegger, Paul)
September 12, 2018 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Elise Nicole Puma for Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Puma, Elise)
September 11, 2018 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 11, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT In Eminent Domain against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6745623, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FERC Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plat Map, #4 Attachment - Notice of Condemnation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Sonderegger, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Pipeline Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi River Transmission Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.06 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hoelscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collector of Revenue of St. Louis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Hoelscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Park and Recreation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.35 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitant St. Louis Sewer District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for Public Land, a Non-Profit California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Paul T. Sonderegger
Represented By: Elise Nicole Puma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?