Robison v. Department of Insurance, Finanical Institutions and Professional Registration et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Travis Robison
Defendant: Jane Doe, Chlora Lindley-Myers, John F. Rehagen, Department of Insurance, Finanical Institutions and Professional Registration, John Huff, Mary Johnson, Kevin Davidson and Carrie Couch
Case Number: 4:2018cv01527
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bryan Travis Robison. Department of Insurance, Finanical Institutions and Professional Registration served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (EAB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bryan Travis Robison. Chlora Lindley-Myers served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (EAB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bryan Travis Robison. Carrie Couch served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (EAB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bryan Travis Robison. Mary Johnson served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (EAB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bryan Travis Robison. Kevin Davidson served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (EAB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bryan Travis Robison. John F. Rehagen served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (EAB)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Carrie Couch, Kevin Davidson, Department of Insurance, Finanical Institutions and Professional Registration, John Huff, Mary Johnson, Chlora Lindley-Myers, John F. Rehagen. The summons were hand delivered to US Marshals Service along with a Complaint and Memorandum and Order. (MCB) (MCB).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. 2] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. The Court notes for the Clerk that plaintiff provided service information for the individual defendants on page eighteen of his complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on October 18, 2018. (MCB)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. sent to non-electronic party this date Thu Oct 18 16:21:26 CDT 2018 (Berg, Melanie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDMENT by Plaintiff Bryan Travis Robison to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (KXS)
September 11, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
September 11, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
September 11, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Sep 11 12:01:03 CDT 2018 (admin,)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bryan Travis Robison. (MFG)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Bryan Travis Robison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robison v. Department of Insurance, Finanical Institutions and Professional Registration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chlora Lindley-Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Rehagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Insurance, Finanical Institutions and Professional Registration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Travis Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?