McFadden v. Jennings
Petitioner: Vincent McFadden
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Case Number: 4:2018cv01559
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Vincent McFadden. (Komp, Laurence)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Laurence E. Komp for Petitioner Vincent McFadden. (Komp, Laurence)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Record Transmittal: The court record has been forwarded to: Laurence Komp. (KCB)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioners motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. #2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks appointment of attorney Laurence Komp, and DENIED in all other respects. [ECF No. #1 ]. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. (A copy of this order mailed to the Plaintiff) . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 09/21/2018. (KCB)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Coulter for Respondent Richard Jennings. (Coulter, Caroline)
September 17, 2018 ***Corrected Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). At the direction of the Court, this case must be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig, United States District Judge. (JWD)
September 17, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Sep 17 15:00:53 CDT 2018 (admin,)
September 17, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 17, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed as a Poor Person in Death Penalty Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Vincent McFadden. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(JWD)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel in a Habeas Corpus Petition Action in a Death Penalty Case by Petitioner Vincent McFadden. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFadden v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Represented By: Caroline M. Coulter
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent McFadden
Represented By: Laurence E. Komp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?