Piper-Culberson v. Fresenius USA Manufacturing. Inc.
Plaintiff: Joann Piper-Culberson
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01659
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.. Parent companies: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America Holdings Limited Partnership, Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGAA, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGAA,. (Baggott, Brian)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baggott, Brian)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.. (Baggott, Brian)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joann Piper-Culberson. Joann Piper-Culberson served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Kaplan, Lawrence)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form and Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Joann Piper-Culberson. (Kaplan, Lawrence)
October 1, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Lawrence P. Kaplan. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joann Piper-Culberson Process Server: Jack Eisen (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Kaplan, Lawrence) Modified on 10/1/2018 (JWD). [Clerk's note: main document is a duplicate of docket entry #2 .]
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joann Piper-Culberson Process Server: Jack Eisen (Kaplan, Lawrence)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Fresenius USA Manufacturing d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care-North America with receipt number 0865-6786916, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Joann Piper-Culberson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B-Right to Sue Letter)(Kaplan, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piper-Culberson v. Fresenius USA Manufacturing. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Piper-Culberson
Represented By: Lawrence P. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Baggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?