Jansen v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Jansen
Defendant: Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan and Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01685
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Deborah Jansen to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/1/2018. (KCB)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by J. Anthony Vessel. (Vessel, J.) Address updated on 10/19/2018 (CAR).
October 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Anthony Vessel. (BRP)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. #4 ) filed by J. Anthony Vessel, counsel for Deborah Jansen, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that J. Anthony Vessel is hereby admitted for the purpose of representing Deborah Jansen in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/15/2018. (BRP)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Deborah Jansen Process Server: Sheeriff (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Vessel, J.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Anthony Vessel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6813489) by Plaintiff Deborah Jansen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Vessel, J.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 4, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to attorney J. Anthony Vessel from Deputy Clerk re: Admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. with receipt number 0865-6791964, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Deborah Jansen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessel, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jansen v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Jansen
Represented By: J. Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?