Rodgers v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Mirion K. Rodgers
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv01727
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mirion K. Rodgers. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (CBL)
October 23, 2018 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Mirion K. Rodgers. (CBL) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/23/2018) (MCB).
October 23, 2018 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) Modified on 10/23/2018 (MCB).
October 15, 2018 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5, 6. Documents sent to party not electronically notified this date. Mon Oct 15 14:11:40 CDT 2018 (Long, Carol)
October 12, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were delivered via interoffice mail to United States Marshal for service. (CBL)
October 12, 2018 5 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty ( 60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/12/2018. (CBL)
October 12, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/12/2018. (CBL)
October 10, 2018 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 10, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Oct 10 12:00:37 CDT 2018 (admin,)
October 10, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
October 10, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
October 9, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mirion K. Rodgers. (BAK)
October 9, 2018 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Jury Demand,, filed by Mirion K. Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirion K. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?