Tyree v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Christine Ann Tyree
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv01786
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Christine Ann Tyree. Defendant All Defendants. (Billington, P.)
November 2, 2018 6 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Christine Ann Tyree. (KEK)
November 2, 2018 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
October 22, 2018 4 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - This case is assigned to Track: 4 Social Security Appeal. This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). See CMO for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/22/18. (ARL)
October 22, 2018 3 REDACTION to #1 Complaint (Social Security),, Supplemental Exhibit A to Complaint (redacted) by Christine Ann Tyree. (Billington, P.)
October 19, 2018 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 19, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney P. Daniel Billington. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
October 19, 2018 1 Social Security COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security with receipt number 0865-6826230, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Christine Ann Tyree. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Nancy A. Berryhill, #4 Summons Jeffrey B. Jensen, #5 Summons Jeff Sessions)(Billington, P.) Modified on 10/19/2018 (JWD). Clerk's note: main document sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyree v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ann Tyree
Represented By: P. Daniel Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?