St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. A.J. Flooring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Gaal, Dan Barger, Renee Bell, Robert Calhoun, Rocky Kloth, Dan Neiswander, Dennis Joyce, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Donald Brussel, Jr., Robert Behlman, Craig McPartlin, Todd Hake, James Carson, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Kent Kiefner, Mike Weis, Albert Bond, Scott Byrne, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Tod O'Donaghue, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Tim Schoolfield, Keith Taylor, Mark Boehms, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council and Jim Sauer
Defendant: A.J. Flooring, Inc., Trish Cox and Kevin Cox
Case Number: 4:2018cv01789
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel An Accounting for Default filed by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis. (Campbell, Greg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel An Accounting for Default by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Juli Laramie, #2 Exhibit 1A to Laramie Aff, #3 Exhibit 1B to Laramie Aff, #4 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Greg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against A.J. Flooring, Inc. by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Default by the Clerk)(Campbell, Greg)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file a motion for entry of default by the Clerk of the Court under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) and, if appropriate, a motion for default judgment under Rule 55(b), supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Courts consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Response to Court due by 12/17/2018.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/3/2018. (MRC)
November 5, 2018 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the). Trish Cox served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. [no.PDF attached. Entry made to correct attorney filing error re #3 ](MRC) (Entered on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the). Kevin Cox served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018 [no.PDF attached. Entry made to correct attorney filing error re #4 ] (MRC)
November 5, 2018 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the). A.J. Flooring, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. [no.PDF attached. Entry made to correct attorney filing error re #5 ] (MRC)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Todd Hake, Mark Boehms, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Albert Bond, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Tod O'Donaghue, Scott Byrne, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Robert Calhoun, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Robert Behlman, Mike Hart, Donald Brussel, Jr, James Carson, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Renee Bell, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, John Gaal. A.J. Flooring, Inc. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Campbell, Greg) [Attorney filing error. Served on date and answer due date incorrect. see Clerk's corrected Summons Returned Executed entry. NEF re-generated. Modified on 11/6/2018 (MRC).]
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Todd Hake, Mark Boehms, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Albert Bond, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Tod O'Donaghue, Scott Byrne, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Robert Calhoun, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Robert Behlman, Mike Hart, Donald Brussel, Jr, James Carson, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Renee Bell, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, John Gaal. Kevin Cox served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Campbell, Greg) [Attorney filing error. Served on date and answer due date incorrect. see Clerk's corrected Summons Returned Executed entry. NEF re-generated. Modified on 11/6/2018 (MRC).
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Todd Hake, Mark Boehms, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Albert Bond, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Tod O'Donaghue, Scott Byrne, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Robert Calhoun, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Robert Behlman, Mike Hart, Donald Brussel, Jr, James Carson, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Renee Bell, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, John Gaal. Trish Cox served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018 (Campbell, Greg) [Attorney filing error. Served on date and answer due date incorrect. see Clerk's corrected Summons Returned Executed entry . NEF re-generated. Modified on 11/6/2018 (MRC).]
October 22, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Greg Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Campbell, Greg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant A.J. Flooring, Inc., Kevin Cox, Trish Cox with receipt number 0865-6826820, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Todd Hake, Mark Boehms, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Albert Bond, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Tod O'Donaghue, Scott Byrne, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Robert Calhoun, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, Tim Schoolfield(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Robert Behlman, Mike Hart, Donald Jr. Brussel, James Carson, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Renee Bell, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, John Gaal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons corporation, #4 Summons Kevin, #5 Summons Trish)(Campbell, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. A.J. Flooring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gaal
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Barger
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Bell
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Calhoun
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Kloth
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Neiswander
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joyce
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brussel, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behlman
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig McPartlin
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hake
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carson
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hart
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Deptula
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Kiefner
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Weis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bond
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Byrne
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod O'Donaghue
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Schoolfield
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Taylor
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Boehms
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Sauer
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?