Bridgeton Landfill, LLC v. Mallinckrodt LLC
Plaintiff: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC and EverZinc USA Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01800
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall email its proposed Order and Attachments filed as Document 9 to the Court in Word format as outlined in the Administrative Procedures Manual for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (available on the Courts website). The parties should contact the Clerk's Office with questions regarding this requirement. The proposed Order shall bear the correct case caption and judge's signature block. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/18/2018. (CLO)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Ronnie L. White no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (BRP)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States District Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case, and the Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign the case to another judge. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 12, 2018. (BRP)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant EverZinc USA Inc.. (Haney, Shannon)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon L. Haney for Defendant EverZinc USA Inc.. (Haney, Shannon)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant EverZinc USA Inc.. Parent companies: EverZinc B.V.; EverZinc Holdings B.V.; Zinc Investment Holdings S.r.l., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Greenberg, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard E. Greenberg for Defendant EverZinc USA Inc.. (Greenberg, Richard)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiff Bridgeton Landfill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beck, William)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant EverZinc USA Inc. The summons was emailed to W. Beck. (KCB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bridgeton Landfill, LLC Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations (Beck, William)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants EverZinc USA Inc. Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued Mallinckrodt LLC, Jury demand, , filed by Bridgeton Landfill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to EverZinc USA Inc.)(Beck, William)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL).Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, a request has been received for random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (CBL)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Bridgeton Landfill, LLC.. (Merrigan, Jessica)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica E. Merrigan for Plaintiff Bridgeton Landfill, LLC. (Merrigan, Jessica)
October 25, 2018 WAIVER of Service issued Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. filed by Bridgeton Landfill, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2018. (MCB)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 24, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number 0865-6832689, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bridgeton Landfill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Beck, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC v. Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC
Represented By: William Garland Beck
Represented By: Jessica E. Merrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EverZinc USA Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L. Haney
Represented By: Richard E. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?