Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 2.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis Charles, State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: American Telephone and Telegraph Company, City of Portage des Sioux, Union Electric Company, Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County, 1.51 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Meyer Agricultural Enterprises, Inc., 2.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, 1.82 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri and Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Case Number: 4:2018cv01846
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Referring Judge: David D Noce
2 Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 (DELETED and redocketed in 4:18cv1327 RWS DDN) First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Meyer Agricultural Enterprises, Inc..(Walker, Jordan) Modified on 11/26/2018 (KKS).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION filed in 4:18cv1327. (Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel and referred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Case administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/10/18. (KXS)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be consolidated with 4:18 CV 1327, reassigned to Chief Judge Rodney W. Sippel, and referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order of Consolidation filed in 4:18 CV 1327 14 be filed in the instant case, and that all future documents be filed in 4:18 CV 1327. Case No. 4:18 CV 1846 shall be administratively closed and no further filings will be accepted in this closed case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/1/2018. (KKS)
October 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Eminent Domain against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6843315, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FERC Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plat Map, #4 Attachment - Notice of Condemnation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Meanes, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 2.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Louis Charles, State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Telephone and Telegraph Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portage des Sioux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.51 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyer Agricultural Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.28 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.82 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Pamela J. Meanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?