Drew v. Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Kleveland Drew
Defendant: John Doe I, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 and Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District
Case Number: 4:2018cv01847
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case Counts I and II and request for leave to amend complaint (by consent) filed by Plaintiff Adrian Kleveland Drew. (Newton, Talmage)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 First MOTION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Adrian Kleveland Drew. (Newton, Talmage) filed by Adrian Kleveland Drew ; GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/30/2018. (AAS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Adrian Kleveland Drew. (Newton, Talmage)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case Counts I and II filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Zeidler, Edward)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case Counts I and II by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Zeidler, Edward)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward W. Zeidler, II for Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Zeidler, Edward)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Adrian Kleveland Drew. Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Newton, Talmage)
October 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Talmage E. Newton, IV. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Adrian Kleveland Drew Process Server: William Stage (BAK)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6843434, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Adrian Kleveland Drew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Attachment Notice of Intent to use Process Server)(Newton, Talmage)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew v. Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District
Represented By: Edward W. Zeidler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Kleveland Drew
Represented By: Talmage E. Newton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?