Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.98 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Donna Kaufmann and William W. Kaufmann as Trustees of the William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, 0.60 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County, Derrill F. Machens as Trustee of the Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, 0.98 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest, City of Portage des Sioux, Elaine June Rufkahr as Trustee of the Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Union Electric Company, Karla J. Machens as Trustee of the Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, 0.78 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri, Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991 and Richard Norbert Rufkahr as Trustee of the Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Case Number: 4:2018cv01848
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: David D Noce
2 Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 (DELETED and redocketed in 4:18cv1327 RWS DDN) First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Derrill F. Machens as Trustee of the Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Donna Kaufmann and William W. Kaufmann as Trustees of the William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017, Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Elaine June Rufkahr as Trustee of the Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Karla J. Machens as Trustee of the Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995, Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, Richard Norbert Rufkahr as Trustee of the Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991, William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017.(Walker, Jordan)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be consolidated with 4:18 CV 1327, reassigned to Chief Judge Rodney W. Sippel, and referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order of Consolidation filed in 4:18 CV 1327 be filed in the instant case, and that all future documents be filed in 4:18 CV 1327. Case No. 4:18 CV 1848 shall be administratively closed and no further filings will be accepted in this closed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/1/18. (KXS)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION filed in 4:18cv1327. (Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel and referred to Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Case administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/10/18. (KXS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 29, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Eminent Domain against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6843593, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FERC Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plat Map, #4 Attachment - Notice of Condemnation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Meanes, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. 0.98 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Kaufmann and William W. Kaufmann as Trustees of the William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.60 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collector of Revenue of St. Charles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrill F. Machens as Trustee of the Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.98 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrill F. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Individuals or Other Legal Entities Who May Claim an Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portage des Sioux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine June Rufkahr as Trustee of the Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Kaufmann and Donna Kaufmann Trust Dated May 4, 2017
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla J. Machens as Trustee of the Karla J. Machens Trust Dated March 10, 1995
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.78 acres of land, more or less, situated in St. Charles County, State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine June Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Norbert Rufkahr as Trustee of the Norbert Rufkahr Trust Revocable Living Trust Agreement Dated February 12, 1991
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Pamela J. Meanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?