Bowles v. Apro International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mariah Diane Bowles
Defendant: Jane Does, Apro International, Inc., John Does, Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, American International Group, Inc. and Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 4:2018cv01869
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mariah Diane Bowles. Apro International, Inc. served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Vlahakis, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Meredith A. Webster for Defendant Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Webster, Meredith)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jean-Paul Assouad for Defendant Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Notice of voluntary dismiss. filed by pltff. GRANTED. SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/11/18. (CLA)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mariah Diane Bowles as to Defendant, American International Group, Inc. only (Vlahakis, James)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mariah Diane Bowles. American International Group, Inc. served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Vlahakis, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. The summons was emailed to James Constantine Vlahakis. (AAS)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Mariah Diane Bowles (Vlahakis, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant American International Group, Inc., Apro International, Inc.. The summons was emailed to James Constantine Vlahakis. (AAS)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Mariah Diane Bowles (Vlahakis, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Mariah Diane Bowles for Defendant Apro International, Inc. (Vlahakis, James)
November 1, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. Summons to issue when Notice of Process Server is filed. (BAK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant American International Group, Inc., Apro International, Inc., Jane Does, John Does, Insurance Company of Pennsylvania with receipt number 0865-6850323, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mariah Diane Bowles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Vlahakis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowles v. Apro International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apro International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Meredith A. Webster
Represented By: Jean-Paul Assouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Diane Bowles
Represented By: James Constantine Vlahakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?