Hooks et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: John Marshall, Steven Sanders, Cynthia Luce, Janis Sanders, Nancy Creamer, Robert Hooks, Ronald Vallieres, Warren Campbell, Douglas Damkroger, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Vincent Ballarino, Lisa Edwards and Vaughn Clark
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv01897
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Vincent Ballarino, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Lisa Edwards, Robert Hooks, Cynthia Luce, John Marshall, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Janis Sanders, Steven Sanders, Ronald Vallieres. (Riegerix, Joseph)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court from the Eastern District of Missouri to Circuit Court for the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, Saint Louis County, Missouri Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Vincent Ballarino, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Lisa Edwards, Robert Hooks, Cynthia Luce, John Marshall, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Janis Sanders, Steven Sanders, Ronald Vallieres. (Riegerix, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hansell, Erik)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court from the Eastern District of Missouri to Circuit Court for the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, Saint Louis County, Missouri and in the Alternative, Motion for Temporary Stay Pending JPML Transfer Ruling filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hansell, Erik)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Vincent Ballarino, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Lisa Edwards, Robert Hooks, Cynthia Luce, John Marshall, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Janis Sanders, Steven Sanders, Ronald Vallieres. (Riegerix, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Vincent Ballarino, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Lisa Edwards, Robert Hooks, Cynthia Luce, John Marshall, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Janis Sanders, Steven Sanders, Ronald Vallieres. (Riegerix, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court from the Eastern District of Missouri to Circuit Court for the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, Saint Louis County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Vincent Ballarino, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Lisa Edwards, Robert Hooks, Cynthia Luce, John Marshall, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Janis Sanders, Steven Sanders, Ronald Vallieres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Acceptance of Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Filing Confirmation for Motion to Appoint Special Process Server)(Riegerix, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court from the Eastern District of Missouri to Circuit Court for the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, Saint Louis County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Vincent Ballarino, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Lisa Edwards, Robert Hooks, Cynthia Luce, John Marshall, James Morris, Donald O'Dell, Janis Sanders, Steven Sanders, Ronald Vallieres. (Riegerix, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hansell, Erik)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Hansell, Erik)
November 7, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by James Morris, Lisa Edwards, Cynthia Luce, Ronald Vallieres, Nancy Creamer, Douglas Damkroger, Warren Campbell, Vaughn Clark, John Marshall, Steven Sanders, Robert Hooks, Donald O'Dell, Vincent Ballarino, Janis Sanders.(BAK)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Hansell, Erik)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 18SL-CC04220, with receipt number 0865-6863221, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Hansell, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Marshall
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Sanders
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Luce
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Sanders
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Creamer
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hooks
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Vallieres
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Campbell
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Damkroger
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morris
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald O'Dell
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Ballarino
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Edwards
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Clark
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Erik L. Hansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?