Brown v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01917
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Counter Claimant Chase Bank USA, N.A., Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Parent companies: JPMorgan Chase & Co., Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: JPMorgan Chase & Co.,. (Guletz, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Michael Brown by Chase Bank USA, N.A..(Guletz, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Chase Bank USA, N.A.'s Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. 4) is GRANTED until January 8, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/6/18. (JEB)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Until January 8, 2019) by Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Guletz, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D. Guletz for Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Guletz, Matthew)
November 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.. The summons was emailed to attorney Gary Eastman. (BAK)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michael Brown Process Server: Brandywine Process Servers, Ltd. (BAK)
November 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. Summons to issue when Notice of Process Server is filed. (BAK)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. with receipt number 0865-6870014, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eastman, Gary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Represented By: Gary Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew D. Guletz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?