Doe v. Haynes et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Cornell Haynes, Jr. and Shantel Jackson
Case Number: 4:2018cv01930
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen Koehler. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6877643) by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Koehler, Karen) filed by Jane Doe ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/16/2018. (AAS)
November 16, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Karen Kathryn Koehler. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons Cornell Haynes, Jr., #2 Summons Shantel Jackson)(Koehler, Karen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/16/2018) (MFG). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/16/2018) (MFG).
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Koehler, Karen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen Koehler. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6877643) by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Koehler, Karen)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6876154, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koehler, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Haynes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Haynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Karen Kathryn Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?