Compassus OP of Missouri LLC v. Azar II
Plaintiff: Compassus OP of Missouri LLC
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Case Number: 4:2018cv01942
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Pursuant to plaintiff's Notice, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/10/18. (CDP)
December 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Compassus OP of Missouri LLC (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: Re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Unopposed by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 12/10/2018.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/3/18. (EAB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of 19 (TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER MOTION HEARING) held on 11/27/18 before Judge Perry. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gayle Madden, Gayle_Madden@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7987. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019. (EAB)
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Unopposed by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 19 (MOTION HEARING) Amended by Compassus OP of Missouri LLC for proceedings held on 11/27/2018 court reporter Gayle Madden before Judge Catherine D. Perry.. (Herrington, Elizabeth) (Forwarded to court reporter on 11/30/2018.) (CBL).
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 19 (MOTION HEARING) by Compassus OP of Missouri LLC for proceedings held on 11/27/2018 court reporter Gayle Madden before Judge Catherine D. Perry.. (Herrington, Elizabeth) (Forwarded to court reporter on 11/30/2018.) (CBL).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 27, 2018. (MCB)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Catherine D. Perry: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2018 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. Arguments heard. The Court takes this matter under advisement until 12:30 p.m. when the Court will issue its ruling. The Court denied the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and written order to follow. (Court Reporter:Gayle Madden, Gayle_Madden@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7987) (proceedings started: 10:02) (proceedings ended: 12:45)(Deputy Clerk: M. Berg)Appearance for Plaintiff: Elizabeth Herrington and Brian Shaffer)(Appearance for Defendant: Amy Sestric and Suzanne Moore) (MCB)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 Motion for leave to file under seal, #15 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation; ORDERED both GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/26/18. (CDP)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 SEALED MOTION to FIle Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Elizabeth Henningfeld Under Seal by Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patient Photos)(Sestric, Amy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #15 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Sestric, Amy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Sestric, Amy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Sestric, Amy)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Suzanne J. Moore for Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Moore, Suzanne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy E. Sestric for Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Sestric, Amy)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Upon the agreement of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order is reset from Tuesday, November 20, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. to Tuesday, November 27, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14-South. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/19/2018. (CBL)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal ; #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian M. Shaffer ; ORDERED both GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/16/18. (CDP)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING HEARING. As requested by plaintiff, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order will be held on Tuesday, November 20, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must make all reasonable efforts to provide notice of this hearing to defendant. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/16/2018. (CBL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian M. Shaffer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6880534) by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shaffer, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Elizabeth Brooke Herrington. Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. Parent companies: Compassus OP Holdings of Missouri, LLC; Compassus OP Holdings I, LLC; Compassus OP Holdings II, LLC; FC Compassus, LLC,. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Bond Order)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Compassus OP of Missouri LLC. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Alex M. Azar II with receipt number 0865-6880348, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by COMPASSUS OP OF MISSOURI LLC d/b/a COMPASSUS HOSPICE AND PALLIATIVE CARE-ST LOUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons AG, #5 Summons USAO, #6 Summons Azar)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compassus OP of Missouri LLC v. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Represented By: Suzanne J. Moore
Represented By: Amy E. Sestric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compassus OP of Missouri LLC
Represented By: Brian W. Shaffer
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?