Downs v. Red Brick Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kim Downs
Defendant: Angie Hickey and Red Brick Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01972
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Red Brick Management, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Lindsey, Nathan)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Angie Hickey, Red Brick Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lindsey, Nathan)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan Asher Lindsey for Defendants Angie Hickey, Red Brick Management, LLC. (Lindsey, Nathan)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Wed Dec 26 14:53:22 CST 2018 (Cordray, Abby)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED up to and including January 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/21/18. (THL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Angie Hickey, Red Brick Management, LLC. (Anderson, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory E. Anderson for Defendants Angie Hickey, Red Brick Management, LLC. (Anderson, Gregory)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kim Downs. Angie Hickey served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018; Red Brick Management, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (KCB)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Tue Dec 11 13:47:49 CST 2018 (Porter, Brittany)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Technical Error (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/10/18. (THL)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION to correct technical error by Plaintiff Kim Downs. (MCB)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Order sent to party not electronically notified this date. Tue Nov 27 08:12:56 CST 2018 (Long, Carol)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Pursuant to the order of recusal by the Honorable Catherine D. Perry on November 26, 2018, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (CBL)
November 26, 2018 Receipt 4644076045 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Kim Downs (CCAM)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. I have determined that I should disqualify myself from this case to avoid any potential appearance of impropriety. See 28 U.S.C. 455. I will therefore direct the Clerk of Court to assign the case randomly to a different Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States District Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case, and the Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign the case to another Judge of this Court. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/26/2018. (CBL)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Kim Downs Process Server: Eastern Missouri Legal Services (BAK)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Angie Hickey, Red Brick Management, LLC 2 Summons(es) issued, Jury Demand,, filed by Kim Downs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(BAK)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Order sent to party not electronically notified this date. Mon Nov 26 15:12:26 CST 2018 (Long, Carol)
November 26, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were hand delivered to Plaintiff Kim Downs. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. Red Brick Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Hickey
Represented By: Gregory E. Anderson
Represented By: Nathan Asher Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Brick Management, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E. Anderson
Represented By: Nathan Asher Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?