Fields v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Keyanna Fields
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv01973
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Keyanna Fields. (ARL)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Plaintiff Keyanna Fields. (KXS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (CLO)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3, 4. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Mon Nov 26 14:41:12 CST 2018 (Olliges, Chelsea)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/26/2018. (CLO)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/26/2018. (CLO)
November 26, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Nov 26 14:00:38 CST 2018 (admin,)
November 26, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 26, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keyanna Fields. (JWD) Clerk's note: document sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains the full name of a minor child.
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, filed by Keyanna Fields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyanna Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?