Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC v. Practecol LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC
Defendant: Practecol LLC and 5 Horizons Group LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02049
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 12:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited, LLC's Complaint by Defendant Practecol LLC. (Martineau, Joseph) filed by Practecol LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/28/19. (CLA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited, LLC's Complaint by Defendant Practecol LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendant Practecol LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. Practecol LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Dickhaus, Karl)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC as to 5 Horizons Group LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 10, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Karl W. Dickhaus. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Summons in a Civil Action - Practecol, LLC by Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM Summons in a Civil Action - 5 Horizons Group, LLC by Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. Parent companies: Sky Light Holdings Limited, a Hong Kong Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Sky Light Holdings Limited, a Hong Kong Corporation,. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC Process Server: Progressive Investigations II, Inc. (Dickhaus, Karl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant 5 Horizons Group LLC, Practecol LLC with receipt number 0865-6914409, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dickhaus, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC v. Practecol LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practecol LLC
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Horizons Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Light Imaging Limited LLC
Represented By: Karl W. Dickhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?