United States of America v. $63,575.00 U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $63,575.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2018cv02131
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party servedJustin K. Gelfand, Esq., Type of return Complaint & Notice,.Tracking Number: 9414816902246689859838, Delivered 1/18/19 (KKS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed party servedJuana Vazquez-Hernandez, Type of return Complaint & Notice, Tracking Number: 9414816902246689859005, delivered 1/19/19 (KKS)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed party served$63,575.00, Type of return Complaint and Warrant (KJS)
December 21, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
December 21, 2018 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant$63,575.00 U.S. Currency. (MFG)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $63,575.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $63,575.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $63,575.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?