Mango v. KTRS-AM, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Gregory Mango
Defendant: KTRS-AM, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02158
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin Powers Mulligan for Defendant KTRS-AM, L.L.C.. (Mulligan, Justin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by KTRS-AM, L.L.C..(Nepple, Michael)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise plead by Defendant KTRS-AM, L.L.C.. (Nepple, Michael) filed by KTRS-AM, L.L.C. ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/29/19. (CLA)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise plead by Defendant KTRS-AM, L.L.C.. (Nepple, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Nepple for Defendant KTRS-AM, L.L.C.. (Nepple, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gregory Mango Process Server: Guaranteed Subpoena Service, Inc. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant KTRS-AM, L.L.C. with receipt number 0865-6949265, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Gregory Mango. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #8 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mango v. KTRS-AM, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Mango
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTRS-AM, L.L.C.
Represented By: Justin Powers Mulligan
Represented By: Michael L. Nepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?