Jordan v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Amber Jordan
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc., Jerry Sherwin and Delissa Spencer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00035
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Referring Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin Joseph Pajda for Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Jerry Sherwin. (Pajda, Colin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Amber Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Marshall v. Walgreens Defense Motion, #2 Exhibit 6 - Maniaci v. Parker Hannifin Mem in Op, #3 Exhibit 7 - Bradley v. First Call Order, #4 Exhibit 8 - Stuart v. Shelter Mut Ins Co Order and Memo in Op, #5 Exhibit 9 - Robertson v. Jetz Service Opinion, #6 Exhibit 10 - Charter Corrective Action Report, #7 Exhibit 11 - Text Message, #8 Exhibit 12 - EEOC Website on Conciliation, #9 Exhibit 13 - Mack v. First Student Opinion)(Furniss, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Jordan, Laura) filed by Charter Communications, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/20/19. (CSG)
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Laura)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Laura)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jerry Sherwin filed by Defendant Jerry Sherwin. (Jordan, Laura)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Jerry Sherwin. (Jordan, Laura) filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Jerry Sherwin; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/14/19. (CSG)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Jerry Sherwin. (Jordan, Laura)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jerry Sherwin filed by Plaintiff Amber Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 4 - State Court Order on Accrual Argument)(Furniss, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Amber Jordan. (Furniss, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri by Plaintiff Amber Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - January 15, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 21, 2019 Emails, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Order on Accrual Argument)(Furniss, Ryan)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jerry Sherwin by Plaintiff Amber Jordan. (Furniss, Ryan) filed by Amber Jordan ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/22/19. (CSG)
January 21, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jerry Sherwin by Plaintiff Amber Jordan. (Furniss, Ryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Charter Communications, Inc..(Jordan, Laura)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jerry Sherwin filed by Defendant Jerry Sherwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge, #2 Exhibit Order and Judgment)(Jordan, Laura) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/22/2019) (JMC).
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Jerry Sherwin by Defendant Jerry Sherwin. (Jordan, Laura)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit State Court File)(Jordan, Laura)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings (KXS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Amber Jordan. (Attachments: #1 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter)(BAK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Defendant Jerry Sherwin. (Jordan, Laura)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Charter Communications (DE), LLC. Parent companies: Charter Communcations, Inc.,. (Jordan, Laura)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Charter Communications (DE), LLC, Jerry Sherwin Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Fed Court)(Jordan, Laura) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/22/2019) (JMC).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the County of St. Louis, case number 18SL-CC04402, with receipt number 0865-6971257, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jerry Sherwin, Charter Communications (DE), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit MCHR Charge, #3 Exhibit Claxton Order, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jordan, Laura) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/22/2019) (JMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Jordan
Represented By: Ryan M. Furniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Colin Joseph Pajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sherwin
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Colin Joseph Pajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delissa Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?