Gerber Life Insurance Company v. Yates et al
Plaintiff: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeannette Stickler, Sean Uhle, Anthony Bove, Lauren Volkerding, Joseph Uhle, Patrick Yates, Deborah Hart, Susan Uhle, Al Uhle, Corey Uhle and Jeanette Uhle
Case Number: 4:2019cv00040
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 ***REMARK: Copy of Order #9 mailed to defendant Deborah Hart at 835 Twin Springs Road,Sullivan, Missouri 63080. (JWD)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, defendant Deborah Hart shall file an answer to the interpleader complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the future, all documents submitted for filing by defendant Deborah Hart shall include a caption, signature, contact information, and certificate of service as stated in this Order, or the documents will be returned without filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the future defendant Deborah Hart shall communicate with the Court in writing by motion or memorandum only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order by regular mail to defendant Deborah Hart at the following address: 835 Twin Springs Road, Sullivan, Missouri 63080. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall docket as a Letter to the Court, for historical purposes only, defendant Deborah Hart's letter dated February 13, 2019. (Answer due as to Deborah Hart: 3/7/2019). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/21/19. (JWD)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Court from defendant Deborah Hart (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (JWD) Modified on 2/21/2019 to correct filing date (JWD).
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL re #7 Summons Returned Executed,,, by Plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Blaire)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. Deborah Hart served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Jeannette Stickler served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Al Uhle served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Corey Uhle served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Joseph Uhle served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019; Sean Uhle served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Susan Uhle served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Lauren Volkerding served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Johnson, Blaire) [Attorney filing error. Returns of service do not include a copy of the summons issued by the Clerk of Court on 1/15/2019. Attorney contacted and instructed to file supplement to these documents. Modified on 2/15/2019 (MRC).]
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Charles A. Shaw for all further proceedings (JAB)
February 5, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 10 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Blaire Bruns Johnson. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company Process Server: Easy-Serve (Attachments: #1 Summons - Patrick Yates, #2 Summons - Deborah Hart, #3 Summons - Joseph Uhle, #4 Summons - Anthony Bove, #5 Summons - Sean Uhle, #6 Summons - Jeannette Stickler, #7 Summons - Lauren Volkerding, #8 Summons - Corey Uhle, #9 Summons - Susan Uhle, #10 Summons - Al Uhle)(Johnson, Blaire)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Interpleader Complaint, Original Filing Form, by Plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Blaire)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Gerber Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Johnson, Blaire)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Interpleader COMPLAINT with receipt number 0865-6971775, in the amount of $400 Non-JuryDemand,, filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Blaire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerber Life Insurance Company v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Stickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Volkerding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?