ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The
Defendant: Aimee Walsh, Rachel Verdugo, Erin Walsh and Kerry Johnson Walsh
Case Number: 4:2019cv00077
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant Kerry Johnson Walsh by Rachel Verdugo, Erin Walsh, Aimee Walsh.(Love, Peter)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rachel Verdugo, Aimee Walsh, Erin Walsh.(Love, Peter)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter H. Love for Defendants Rachel Verdugo, Aimee Walsh, Erin Walsh. (Love, Peter)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The Kerry Johnson Walsh waiver signed on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Jellinek, Charles)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn Palmer Scott for Plaintiff ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The. (Scott, Kathryn)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The Rachel Verdugo waiver signed on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Jellinek, Charles)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The Erin Walsh waiver signed on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Jellinek, Charles)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The Aimee Walsh waiver signed on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Jellinek, Charles)
January 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 4. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The. (Jellinek, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Jellinek, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Petition in Interpleader against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6987705, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service - Aimee Walsh, #4 Waiver of Service - Erin Walsh, #5 Waiver of Service - Rachel Verdugo, #6 Waiver of Service - Kerry Johnson Walsh)(Jellinek, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESCO Employee Savings Investment Plan, The
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Represented By: Kathryn Palmer Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Walsh
Represented By: Peter H. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Verdugo
Represented By: Peter H. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Walsh
Represented By: Peter H. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Johnson Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?